EP0046848 - Method of filling tanker vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Wolfgang Goethestrasse 16 D-7888 Rheinfelden / DE | [1982/10] | Application number, filing date | 81104685.3 | 19.06.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | DE19803033108 | 03.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3033108 | [1982/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046848 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046848 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046848 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/32, B65G67/04, B65B1/20 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
B65G53/06 (EP);
B60P1/60 (EP);
B65G67/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/13] | B65G65/32, B60P1/60, B65B1/20 | ||
Former IPC [1982/10] | B65G67/04, B60P1/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befüllen von Silofahrzeugen | [1982/10] | English: | Method of filling tanker vehicles | [1982/10] | French: | Procédé pour le remplissage de véhicules-silos | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1981 | Examination requested [1982/10] | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE595796 [ ] (HENSCHEL & SOHN AG); | DE836159 [ ] (HANS DOHSE); | DE893497 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | US2806771 [ ] (RUSSELL CUTHBERTSON CHARLES, et al); | US2815621 [ ] (FREEMONT CARTER CLARENCE); | DE2514316 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2810244 [ ] (FRANZ HOFFMANN & SOEHNE KG CHE) |