EP0046176 - Enzymatic conversion of red cells for transfusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Blood Center, Inc. 310 East 67 Street New York, New York 10021 / US | [1982/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Jack, Dr. 450 East 63 Street New York New York 10021 / US | [1982/08] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105010.3 | 27.06.1981 | [1982/08] | Priority number, date | US19800177972 | 14.08.1980 Original published format: US 177972 | [1982/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046176 | Date: | 24.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046176 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046176 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/00, C07K15/08, C12P21/00, A61K35/18, A61K39/00 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
A61K35/18 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/08] | C07G7/00, C12P21/00, A61K35/18, A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/08] | Title | German: | Enzymatische Umwandlung roter Zellen für Transfusionen | [1982/08] | English: | Enzymatic conversion of red cells for transfusion | [1982/08] | French: | Conversion enzymatique de cellules rouges pour transfusions | [1982/08] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Archives of Biochemistry and Biophysics, Vol. 170, 1975, New York, US N. HARPAZ et al. "Studies on beta-Antigenic Sites of Human Erythrocytes by use of Coffee Bean alfa-Galactosidase", pages 676-683 * page 678, column 2, line 36 to page 679, column 1, line 9 * * page 679, column 1, line 23 to column 2, line 5 * * page 682, column 2, lines 45-53 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 84, No. 17, April 26, 1976 page 391, Abstract 119839e Columbus, Ohio, US O. KUNIO et al. "Blood Group Substance-Degrading Enzymes Obtained from Streptomyces Sp. part IV. Conversion of Human Blood group B and AB Red Bloodcells to group O and A Cells by Streptomyces Enzyme" & Agric Biol. Chem. 1976, 40(1) 67-71 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 87, No. 13, September 26, 1977 page 261, Abstract 97954w Columbus, Ohio, US N. HARPAZ et al. "alfa-D-Galactosidase from Soybeans Destroying Bloodgroup B Antigens. Purification by Affinity Chromatography and Properties" & Eur. J. Biochem, 1977, 77(2), 419-26. * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 84, No. 11, March 15, 1976 page 155, Abstract 70778t Columbus, Ohio, US A.D. YATES et al. "Linkage Specific alfa-D-Galactosidase from Trichomonas Foetus: Characterisation of the Blood-Group B-Destroying Enzyme as A 1, 3-alfa-Galactosidase and the Blood-Group P1-Destroying Enzyme as a 1, 4-alfa-Galactosidase" & Febs Lett; 1975, 60(2), 281-5 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 13, March 27, 1978 page 244, Abstract 86059c Columbus, Ohio, US E. TANIMOTO et al. "alfa- and beta-Glycosidases in Maize Roots" & Planta 1978, 138(2), 119-22 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 84, 1976 page 269, Abstract 41298f Columbus, Ohio, US F. AFIFI et al. "Metabolic Modifications Observed in Erythrecytes during the Preservation of Blood in ACD (Acid-Citrate-Destrose) Medium" & Actual. Transfus. C.R. Congr. Natl. Transufus. Sang. 9th, 1973, (pub. 1974) 146-54 * Abstract * | Examination | - K. OISHI & K. AIDA, Agr. Biol. Chem. 40(1), p. 67-71, 1976 | - HARPAZ et al., Eur J. Biochem. 77, 419-426, 1977 |