blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0046490

EP0046490 - Electronic device for stabilizing the idling speed of an internal-combustions engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.1984
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.02.1985 [1985/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/09]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hartig, Gunter F., Dr.
Im Laubenweg 14
D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE
[1982/09]
Application number, filing date81105070.730.06.1981
[1982/09]
Priority number, dateDE1980302619210.07.1980         Original published format: DE 3026192
[1982/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0046490
Date:03.03.1982
Language:DE
[1982/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0046490
Date:22.02.1984
Language:DE
[1984/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.1981
ClassificationIPC:F02P5/04
[1982/09]
CPC:
F02P5/1551 (EP,US); Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1982/09]
TitleGerman:Elektronische Einrichtung zur Leerlaufstabilisierung von Verbrennungsmotoren[1982/09]
English:Electronic device for stabilizing the idling speed of an internal-combustions engine[1982/09]
French:Dispositif électronique pour la stabilisation du ralenti de moteurs à combustion interne[1982/09]
Examination procedure30.06.1981Examination requested  [1982/09]
15.11.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.08.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.1983Fee for grant paid
11.08.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1985/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2720609  [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 US4128091  [ ] (BALAN ISADORE, et al);
 US3322107  [ ] (MIERAS LAURENCE F, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.