EP0043988 - Method for analyzing stored image details [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1986 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1986 [1986/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palmguard Inc. 12810 S.W. Canyon Road Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | For all designated states Palmguard Inc. 12810 S.W. Canyon Road Beaverton Oregon 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moulton, Clifford H. 4175 S.W. Dogwood Lane Portland Oregon 97225 / US | [1982/03] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim, et al Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/03] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105107.7 | 01.07.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | US19800165603 | 03.07.1980 Original published format: US 165603 | [1982/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043988 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043988 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, A61B5/10, G06K9/56 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06V10/36 (EP,US);
G06V10/40 (EP,US);
G06V40/1365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Analyse gespeicherter Bildeinzelheiten | [1982/03] | English: | Method for analyzing stored image details | [1982/03] | French: | Méthode pour l'analyse des détails stockés d'une image | [1982/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/39] | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3614737 [ ] (SADOWSKY CHARLES); | US3851282 [ ] (WATSON B); | US3959769 [ ] (STERNBERG JACOB, et al); | FR2294490 [ ] (SCHLUMBERGER COMPTEURS [FR]); | US4032889 [ ] (NASSIMBENE ERNIE GEORGE); | US4139779 [ ] (EHRAT KURT); | US4186378 [ ] (MOULTON CLIFFORD H [US]) | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 18, No. 3, August 1975, W.J. DEERHAKE et al, "Handprint Verification", pages 890, 891. * whole document * | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 21, No. 6, November 1978, E.G. NASSIMBENE: "Personal Verification- Knuckle Contour Detection" pages 2523-2525 * complete document * | Examination | US3581282 |