Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3163073D1 | 17.05.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3039967 | 23.10.1980 | DE3163073 | 15.07.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0050710 | Global Dossier | 11.04.1984 | B1 | EP0050710 | 05.05.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3039967 | 23.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3039967 | 03.06.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3039967 | 23.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5799266 | 19.06.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3039967 | 23.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4388908 | 21.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3039967 | 23.10.1980 |