EP0047836 - Edge filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.1984 [1984/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hünten, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Weyerhardt 11 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1982/12] | Application number, filing date | 81105589.6 | 16.07.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | DE19803034678 | 13.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3034678 | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047836 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047836 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047836 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/18, B01D33/10 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/44 (EP,US);
B01D29/6476 (EP,US);
B01D29/682 (EP,US);
B01D29/688 (EP,US);
B01D29/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Spaltfilter | [1982/12] | English: | Edge filter | [1982/12] | French: | Filtre à arêtes | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 15.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB688265 (CHARLES SAMUEL GARLAND, et al); | [A]FR2204443 (HAGIHARA TADASHI [JP]); | [A]FR1227991 (GEN ENGINEERING COMPANY AB); | [A]FR1213274 (PREP IND COMBUSTIBLES) |