EP0045023 - Method for the realization of insulated plastered surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1986 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Traub, Eugen Nordstrasse 25 D-7101 Abstatt-Happenbach / DE | For all designated states Traub, Tillo Ulmenstrasse 10 D-7129 Ilsfeld-Helfenberg / DE | [1982/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/05] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105653.0 | 18.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | DE19803028667 | 29.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3028667 | [1982/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045023 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045023 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/04, E04F13/02 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
E04F13/02 (EP);
E04F13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen gedämmter Putzfassaden | [1982/05] | English: | Method for the realization of insulated plastered surfaces | [1982/05] | French: | Procédé pour la réalisation de façades calorifuges enduites | [1982/05] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 09.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.04.1985 | NL | 17.04.1985 | SE | 30.04.1985 | LU | 31.07.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 17.04.1985 | |
NL | 17.04.1985 | ||
SE | 30.04.1985 | ||
GB | 18.07.1985 | ||
LU | 31.07.1985 | ||
Former [1989/24] | BE | 17.04.1985 | |
NL | 17.04.1985 | ||
SE | 30.04.1985 | ||
GB | 18.07.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | BE | 17.04.1985 | |
NL | 17.04.1985 | ||
SE | 30.04.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 17.04.1985 | |
NL | 17.04.1985 | ||
Former [1986/28] | NL | 17.04.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1303680 [ ]; | DE2516916 [ ] (HECK FRIEDRICH); | DE2713487 [ ] (KARNER KARL); | DE2850861 [ ] (HECK FRIEDRICH) |