EP0046203 - Multiprocessor arrangement with a common bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1986 [1986/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Means, Rodney Jerome 6988 East Calle Cerca Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | 02 /
Plunkett, Galen Price, Jr. 9526 Ashbourn Drive Burke Virginia 22015 / US | 03 /
Dennis, Charles Alan Route 4, Box 209 Warrington Virginia 22186 / US | 04 /
Moon, John Lee 3205 Adams Mill Road N.W., Washington D.C. 20010 / US | [1982/08] | Representative(s) | Lewit, Leonard IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | Lewit, Leonard, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105739.7 | 21.07.1981 | [1982/08] | Priority number, date | US19800179904 | 20.08.1980 Original published format: US 179904 | [1982/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046203 | Date: | 24.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046203 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F13/36 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G06F13/374 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/08] | G06F3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/08] | Title | German: | Multiprozessoranordnung mit einem gemeinsamen Bus | [1982/08] | English: | Multiprocessor arrangement with a common bus | [1982/08] | French: | Système multiprocesseur comportant un bus commun | [1982/08] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 03.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2015217 [ ] (IBM); | US4156277 [ ] (PARKER MARSHALL M [US], et al); | US3997896 [ ] (CASSARINO JR FRANK V, et al); | US3818447 [ ] (CRAFT D) | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Communications Vol. COM-28, No. 12, December 1980, New York, US J.W. MARK "Distributed Scheduling Conflict-Free Multiple Access for Local Area Communications Net-works", pages 1968-1976. * page 1969, left-hand column, line 31 to line 38; right-hand column, lines 6-13 * |