EP0048323 - Product in powder form for the treatment of wounds, and method for the preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Herbert, Prof., Dr. Höllentalstrasse 20 D-7815 Burg / DE | 02 /
Kickhöfen, Botho, Dr. Wildtalstrasse 56 D-7800 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Vaubel, Ekkehard, Prof., Dr. Klinikum Steglitz der Freien Universität Berlin Hindenburgdamm 30 D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105755.3 | 21.07.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | DE19803036033 | 24.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3036033 | [1982/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048323 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048323 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/01, A61K37/12, A61K31/78 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
A61L26/008 (EP,US);
A61K31/78 (EP,US);
A61L26/0052 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L26/0052, C08L33/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Wundbehandlungsmittel in Pulverform und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1982/13] | English: | Product in powder form for the treatment of wounds, and method for the preparation thereof | [1982/13] | French: | Produit sous forme de poudre pour le traitement de blessures; son procédé de préparation | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/16] | 19.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2215230 [ ] (PHARMACIA AB [SE]); | US3963685 [ ] (ABRAHAMS ROBERT A); | FR2302752 [ ] (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]); | DE2849570 [ ] (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) |