Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE6218T | 15.03.1984 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81105796 | 22.07.1981 | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3162290D1 | 22.03.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | DE3162290 | 22.07.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0045443 | Global Dossier | 15.02.1984 | B1 | EP0045443 | 10.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR223938 | 30.09.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8104913 | 13.04.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3029128 | 11.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5754011 | 31.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO151350C | 27.03.1985 | C | NO151350B | 17.12.1984 | B | NO812594L | 01.02.1982 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3029128 | 31.07.1980 |