blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0046875

EP0046875 - Control signal transmission device, especially for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.1990
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.08.1990 [1990/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
81663 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/31]For all designated states
Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
D-81663 München / DE
Former [1982/10]For all designated states
Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Robert-Koch-Strasse
D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wendt, Joachim
Harburger Strasse 63 F
D-2159 Buxtehude / DE
[1982/10]
Application number, filing date81105812.223.07.1981
[1982/10]
Priority number, dateDE1980303291802.09.1980         Original published format: DE 3032918
DE1981311172225.03.1981         Original published format: DE 3111722
[1982/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0046875
Date:10.03.1982
Language:DE
[1982/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0046875
Date:21.11.1985
Language:DE
[1985/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0046875
Date:20.09.1989
Language:DE
[1989/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.1985
ClassificationIPC:B64C13/50, H04B9/00, G06F15/50
[1982/10]
CPC:
H04B10/27 (EP,US); B64C13/505 (EP,US); G05D1/0061 (EP,US);
G05D1/0077 (EP,US); H04B10/278 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1982/10]
TitleGerman:Anordnung, insbesondere für Luftfahrzeuge zur Übertragung von Steuersignalen[1982/10]
English:Control signal transmission device, especially for aircraft[1982/10]
French:Dispositif de transmission de signaux de commande, notamment pour avions[1982/10]
Examination procedure09.03.1982Examination requested  [1982/36]
24.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.1989Fee for grant paid
28.04.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP87113946.5  / EP0267397
EP87113965.5  / EP0268041
EP87113966.3  / EP0267398
Opposition(s)21.06.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/35]
Request for further processing for:20.01.1989Request for further processing filed
20.01.1989Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.03.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 07
03.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3076510  (PIEL ALFRED J);
 [A]FR2258611  (KRUPP GMBH [DE]);
 [A]US3964020  (DICKERSON ARTHUR F);
 [A]FR2391908  (WIECZOREK JULIEN [FR]);
 [YP]GB2052185  (SUNDSTRAND CORP)
 [Y]  - Frequenz, Band 31, Heft 12, Dezember 1977, seiten 364-368, Berlin, DE K. ERDEL: "Glasfaser-Bussysteme zur Signalubertragung in Bordnetzen."
 [Y]  - L'Onde Electrique, Band 56, Heft 12, Dezember 1976, seiten 589-596, Paris, FR T. HAWKES: "Systemes de Communications Optiques a Bord d'Avions."
 [A]  - IEEE Transactions on Aerospace and Electronic Systems, Band AES-11, Heft 5, September, seiten 841-850; IEEE, New York, US G. BELCHER: "Use of Fiber Optics in Digital Automatic Flight Control Systems."
 [A]  - Westinghouse Engineer, Band 31, Heft 4, Juli 1971, seiten 114-119; Pittsburgh, US M.A. GEYER et al.: "Automatic Control of Aircraft Electrical System Reduces Wiring and Improves Reliability."
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.