Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] |
16.04.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] |
19.01.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.03.1982 [1982/12] |
27.11.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.01.1982 [1982/04] |