EP0045074 - Apparatus for measuring the contact resistance of electrolytically applied surface films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/05] | Process and apparatus for measuring the contact resistance of galvanic surface films | ||
[1985/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boone, Didier Nieuwstrasse 7 B-8042 Oostkamp / BE | 02 /
Cousin, Rolf, Ing.grad. Hazelare 4 B-8021 Loppem / BE | [1982/05] | Application number, filing date | 81105880.9 | 24.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | DE19803028535 | 28.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3028535 | [1982/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045074 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045074 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/20 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
G01R27/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1982/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Übergangswiderstandes galvanisch aufgetragener Oberflächenschichten | [1985/02] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the contact resistance of electrolytically applied surface films | [1985/02] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la résistance de contact de films superficiels deposés par électrolyse | [1985/02] |
Former [1982/05] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung des Übergangswiderstandes galvanischer Oberflächenschichten | ||
Former [1982/05] | Process and apparatus for measuring the contact resistance of galvanic surface films | ||
Former [1982/05] | Procédé et dispositif de mesure de la résistance de contact de films électrolytiques superficiels | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/05] | 18.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, Band 13, Nr. 12, Dezember 1974, seiten 1996-2003 Tokyo, JP. O. MICHIKAMI: "Study on the Constriction Resistance of Electric Contact" * figur 7 auf seite 2000 Sowie die Absatze 4.1 "Apparatus and Procedure" und 4.2 "Prepatation of Specimens" auf den seiten 2000 und 2001 * | [ ] - Journal of Physics E Scientific Instruments, Band 10, Nr. 4, April 1977, seiten 330-332 London, G.B. E.R. WALLACH et al.: "A Test Facility for the Measurement of very Small Resistances" * seite 331, figur 2 und linke spalte, zeilen 1-3 * | [ ] - Electronics, Band 48, Nr. 22, 30. Oktober 1975, seiten 105-107 New York, U.S.A. S. GARTE: "What Designers Need to Know About Low-Voltage Contacts" * seite 107, figur 4 und linke spalte, zeilen 4-11 * |