EP0045892 - Process for the preparation of precursors for polymers containing the oxazolin-2-one ring, and their use in the production of high molecular weight polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasshofer, Werner, Dr. Wolfskaul 10 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Grögler, Gerhard, Dr. von-Diergardt-Strasse 46 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Meyborg, Holger, Dr. Bergisch-Gladbacher-Strasse 1 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1982/07] | Application number, filing date | 81105907.0 | 27.07.1981 | [1982/07] | Priority number, date | DE19803029922 | 07.08.1980 Original published format: DE 3029922 | [1982/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045892 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045892 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/58, C08G18/28, C08G18/38, C08G73/00, C08G73/22 | [1982/07] | CPC: |
C07D263/62 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/3844 (EP,US);
C08G18/80 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3844 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Oxazolin-2-on-Ringe aufweisenden Kunststoffvorläufern und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von hochmolekularen Kunststoffen | [1982/07] | English: | Process for the preparation of precursors for polymers containing the oxazolin-2-one ring, and their use in the production of high molecular weight polymers | [1982/07] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de précurseurs de matières plastiques contenant des noyaux oxazolin-2-one et leur utilisation dans la fabrication de matières plastiques de poids moléculaire élevé | [1982/07] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1981 | Examination requested [1982/07] | 08.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.1984 | [1991/51] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2012809 [ ] (BAYER) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, Nr, 5, 30. Januar 1978 Columbus, Ohio, USA J.F. KINSTLE et al. "Synthesis and Characterization of Linear and Crosslinked AB-type Polyurethanes" seite 17, Abstract Nr. 38384h & Chem. Prop. Crosslinked Polym. (Proc. ACS Symp.) 1976, seiten 21bis47 |