EP0045894 - Reincorporation of cocoa aroma [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franklin, James Gordon Av.de la Prairie 9bis CH-1800 Vevey / CH | 02 /
Rütter, Bernhard Geissmattstrasse 30 CH-6004 Lucerne / CH | [1982/07] | Application number, filing date | 81105912.0 | 27.07.1981 | [1982/07] | Priority number, date | US19800177469 | 12.08.1980 Original published format: US 177469 | [1982/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045894 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045894 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045894 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23G1/04 | [1982/07] | CPC: |
A23G1/56 (EP,US);
A23G1/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/07] | Title | German: | Wiedereinmischen von Kakaoaroma | [1982/07] | English: | Reincorporation of cocoa aroma | [1982/07] | French: | Réincorporation d'arôme de cacao | [1982/07] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1981 | Examination requested [1982/07] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB524158 (SUISSE AMERICAINE D ETUDES ET); | [A]FR1107508 (GEN FOODS CORP); | [Y]US2850388 (PEEBLES DAVID D, et al); | [Y]US3027257 (SHENKENBERG DAVID R); | [Y]DE1152299 (WILLI RAU); | [Y]FR1393017 (KONINK FABRIEK VAN CACAO EN CH); | [Y]GB1084385 (GUSTAV GRUN); | [A]US3418134 (ROOKER WILLIAM A); | [Y]FR2054308 (CACAOFABRIEK DE ZAAN NV); | [A]DE2055030 ; | [A]CH527574 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [A]FR2328411 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]DE2700817 (LUCO TECHNIC GMBH) |