EP0045493 - Composition useful for preparing face masks and process preparing such composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindenthal, Margaret 1417 Villege Court Mountain View Calif.94040 / US | 02 /
Edelstein, Herb 1178 Hyde Avenue San Jose Calif.95129 / US | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/06] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr. Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106007.8 | 30.07.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | US19800174051 | 31.07.1980 Original published format: US 174051 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045493 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045493 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/042 (EP);
A61K8/0212 (EP);
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/06] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Gesichtsmasken und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Zusammensetzung | [1982/06] | English: | Composition useful for preparing face masks and process preparing such composition | [1982/06] | French: | Composition servant à préparer des masques faciaux et sa méthode de préparation | [1982/06] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 26.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/36] | 11.03.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2996432 ; | [Y]US3164523 | [A] - H. JANISTIJN: "Handbuch der Kosmetika und Riechstoffe", vol. 1, 2nd edition 1960, H}thig Verlag, Heidelberg, DE. |