EP0046518 - Package for surgical suture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1984 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermedicat GmbH Gerliswilstrasse 45 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [1982/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fontana, Karl-Heinz Ahornweg 3 D-3501 Körle / DE | [1982/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1983/28] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1982/09] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106015.1 | 31.07.1981 | [1982/09] | Priority number, date | DE19803032037 | 26.08.1980 Original published format: DE 3032037 | [1982/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046518 | Date: | 03.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046518 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, B65D75/58 | [1982/09] | CPC: |
B65D75/5833 (EP);
A61B17/06138 (EP);
A61B2017/06142 (EP);
B65D75/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/11] |
Former [1982/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Packung für chirurgisches Nahtmaterial | [1982/09] | English: | Package for surgical suture | [1982/09] | French: | Emballage pour fil de suture chirurgical | [1982/09] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 04.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3174654 [ ] (GEORGE REINER); | US3389850 [ ] (ROCKEFELLER WINSTON G); | DE1966391 [ ] (ETHICON INC); | FR2188569 [ ] (UNIONPACK ABFULL VERP GUNDERMA [DE]); | US4089410 [ ] (BOLANOWSKI LELIA ANN, et al); | US4135622 [ ] (GLICK ARTHUR) |