EP0047398 - Hypodermic cartridge syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLPO COMPANY LIMITED 8th Floor Pine Central Bldg. No.11-5, 2-chome Kyobashi, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1982/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takasugi, Mitsuo No. 74, Kuritaya Kanagawa-ku Yokohama Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Okuyama, Yoshio No. 13-7, 3-chome, Shimouma Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/11] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106128.2 | 05.08.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | JP19800106806 | 05.08.1980 Original published format: JP 10680680 | [1982/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047398 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047398 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
A61M5/2425 (EP,US);
Y10S604/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/11] | Title | German: | Injektionsspritze mit Ampulle | [1982/11] | English: | Hypodermic cartridge syringe | [1982/11] | French: | Seringue à ampoule hypodermique | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 20.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.1985 | SE | 06.08.1985 | CH | 31.08.1985 | LI | 31.08.1985 | LU | 31.08.1985 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/20] | AT | 05.08.1985 | |
SE | 06.08.1985 | ||
CH | 31.08.1985 | ||
LI | 31.08.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | AT | 05.08.1985 | |
SE | 06.08.1985 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 05.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE217162 [ ]; | US2514575 [ ] (HEIN HOWARD T, et al); | US3110309 [ ] (HIGGINS JOHN L); | GB1103917 [ ] (KARL GEORG JANSSON); | FR2223051 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) |