blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0046529

EP0046529 - Reader device for reading the impressions obtained during hardness tests according to the Vickers method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.07.1982
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RIV-SKF OFFICINE DI VILLAR PEROSA S.p.A
Via Mazzini 53
I-10123 Torino / IT
[1982/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Borio, Sergio
Via Zaglione 7
I-10100 Torino / IT
[1982/09]
Representative(s)Bongiovanni, Guido, et al
STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1982/09]Bongiovanni, Guido, et al
STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9
I-10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date81106175.306.08.1981
[1982/09]
Priority number, dateIT1980006831726.08.1980         Original published format: IT 6831780
[1982/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0046529
Date:03.03.1982
Language:EN
[1982/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:G01N3/42, G01B11/28
[1982/09]
CPC:
G01N3/42 (EP); G01B11/28 (EP); G01N2203/0098 (EP);
G01N2203/0647 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1982/09]
TitleGerman:Auswertevorrichtung zum Auswerten von Eindrücken, die bei Härteprüfungen nach der Vickers-Methode erhalten werden[1982/09]
English:Reader device for reading the impressions obtained during hardness tests according to the Vickers method[1982/09]
French:Appareil de lecture pour déterminer l'empreinte obtenue pendant les essais de dureté selon la méthode Vickers[1982/09]
File destroyed:19.02.1989
Examination procedure03.06.1982Application withdrawn by applicant  [1982/36]
08.06.1982Application withdrawn by applicant  [1982/37]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS2713259  [ ] (PAUL GRODZINSKI, et al);
 US3822946  [ ] (RYNKOWSKI G);
 DE2331124  [ ] (REINIGER SIEGFRIED DR ING);
 US4147052  [ ] (TSUJIUCHI JUNPEI, et al);
 FR2410267  [ ] (VICKERS LTD [GB]);
 DE2848204  [ ] (KLEESATTEL CLAUS DR)
    [ ] - Optik, Vol. 37, No. 1, January 1973 Stuttgart, DE S. REINIGER: "Photometrisches Messen von Vickers-Harteeindrucken"pages 8-14 * paragrapg 2; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.