EP0049345 - Apparatus and arrangement for calibrating a gas analysis plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH Thiemannstrasse 1 12059 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | For all designated states AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH Thiemannstrasse 1 D-12059 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albrecht, Peter Hochwaldsteig 10 D-1000 Berlin 22 / DE | 02 /
Willecke, Raimund Markgrafenstrasse 29a D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 03 /
Leins, Rudolf Grünberger Strasse 2 D-5047 Wesseling / DE | [1982/15] | Application number, filing date | 81106275.1 | 12.08.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | DE19803038423 | 08.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3038423 | [1982/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049345 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049345 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049345 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G01N37/00 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Anordnung zum Kalibrieren einer Gasmessanlage | [1982/15] | English: | Apparatus and arrangement for calibrating a gas analysis plant | [1982/15] | French: | Appareil et agencement pour calibrer une installation d'analyse de gaz | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 27.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.1987
22.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Drägerwerk AG D-23542 Lübeck / DE | [1987/44] | 13.10.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.01.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/10] | Appeal following opposition | 22.09.1988 | Appeal received No. T0503/88 | 22.12.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.1989 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1989/39] | 14.12.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 13.08.1987 | [2015/21] |
Former [1990/28] | CH | 10.12.1986 | |
LI | 10.12.1986 | ||
SE | 13.08.1987 | ||
Former [1989/19] | SE | 13.08.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2645736 ; | [A]BE650712 ; | [A]US4151738 ; | [A]GB1174982 |