blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0046556

EP0046556 - Diisocyanates or mixtures of diisocyanates of the diphenylmethane class, processes for their preparation, as well as their use as synthesis components in the manufacture of polyurethanes by the isocyanate-polyaddition process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/09]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knöfel, Hartmut, Dr.
Dülmener Weg 21
D-5068 Odenthal-Erberich / DE
02 / Brockelt, Michael
Neuhauser Weg 1
D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE
[1982/09]
Application number, filing date81106366.817.08.1981
[1982/09]
Priority number, dateDE1980303212826.08.1980         Original published format: DE 3032128
[1982/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0046556
Date:03.03.1982
Language:DE
[1982/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0046556
Date:09.03.1983
Language:DE
[1983/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1981
ClassificationIPC:C07C119/048, C07C118/02, C08G18/76
[1982/09]
CPC:
C07C265/12 (EP,US); C07C205/06 (EP,US); C08G18/7671 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1982/09]
TitleGerman:Neue Diisocyanate bzw. Diisocyanatgemische der Diphenylmethanreihe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, sowie ihre Verwendung als Aufbaukomponente bei der Herstellung von Polyurethankunststoffen nach dem Isocyanat-Polyadditionsverfahren[1982/09]
English:Diisocyanates or mixtures of diisocyanates of the diphenylmethane class, processes for their preparation, as well as their use as synthesis components in the manufacture of polyurethanes by the isocyanate-polyaddition process[1982/09]
French:Diisocyanates et mélanges de diisocyanates du type diphénylméthane, procédé pour leur préparation ainsi que leur application comme composants de synthèse lors de la fabrication de polyuréthanes en utilisant le procédé de polyaddition des isocyanates[1982/09]
Examination procedure17.08.1981Examination requested  [1982/09]
02.06.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.09.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.1982Fee for grant paid
09.09.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.1983No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3152162  [ ] (PETER FISCHER, et al);
 EP0024323  [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]);
 US3644457  [ ] (KONIG KLAUS, et al);
 DE1901993  [ ] (BASF AG);
 GB1117066  [ ] (ICI LTD);
 GB1013710  [ ] (DU PONT);
 EP0024665  [ ];
 GB1163264  [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.