EP0046291 - Substituted caprolactam derivatives as antihypertensives, process for preparing them, pharmaceutical composition containing them, and intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harris, Elbert E. 220 Linden Avenue Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 02 /
Patchett, Arthur A. 1090 Minisink Way Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 03 /
Thorsett, Eugene D. 4 Poplar Place Fanwood New Jersey 07023 / US | [1982/08] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/08] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106372.6 | 17.08.1981 | [1982/08] | Priority number, date | US19800179305 | 18.08.1980 Original published format: US 179305 | US19810282580 | 13.07.1981 Original published format: US 282580 | [1982/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046291 | Date: | 24.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046291 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046291 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/02 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
C07K5/0222 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/08] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/13] |
Former [1982/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Substituierte Caprolactam-Derivate als Antihypertonika, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung und Zwischenprodukte | [1982/08] | English: | Substituted caprolactam derivatives as antihypertensives, process for preparing them, pharmaceutical composition containing them, and intermediates | [1982/08] | French: | Dérivés de caprolactame substitués utilisables comme agents antihypertensifs, leur procédé de préparation, composition pharmaceutique les contenant et produits intermédiaires | [1982/08] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/50] | 07.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0026640 [ ]; | DD148770 [ ]; | EP0017309 [ ] |