EP0047409 - Offset compensation for switched capacitor integrators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1987 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN MICROSYSTEMS, INCORPORATED 3800 Homestead Road Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [1982/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haque, Yusuf A. 2052 Laddie Way San Jose, California 95121 / CA | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106407.0 | 18.08.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | US19800185356 | 08.09.1980 Original published format: US 185356 | [1982/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047409 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047409 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047409 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/186 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
G06G7/1865 (EP,US);
H03F3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1982/11] | Title | German: | Offsetausgleich für geschaltete Kapazitätsintegratoren | [1982/11] | English: | Offset compensation for switched capacitor integrators | [1982/11] | French: | Compensation de tension de décalage pour intégrateurs à capacité commutée | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 26.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4163947 (WEEDON HANS J [US]); | [Y]GB1421768 (GEC MEDICAL EQUIPMENT LTD); | [Y]US3879668 (EDWARDS ALLEN PONSFORD); | [Y]FR2093486 (IWATSU ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, volume SC-12, no. 6, December 1977, New York (US) B.J. HOSTICKA et al.: "MOS Sampled Data Recursive Filters using Switched Capacitor Integrators", pages 600-608 | Examination | - U. Tielze, Ch. Schenk, Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik, 3rd edition, 1974, Springer Verlag, Berlin, pages 68-71 |