EP0047876 - Bottle-box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.1983 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEROLINA KUNSTSTOFF-GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. & CO. Verarbeitungs- und Vertriebs KG Altonaerstrasse 79-81 D-13581 Berlin / DE | [1982/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auer, Helmut, Dipl.-Kfm Jägerstrasse 30 D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Oedekoven, Wolf Dieter Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-8000 München 22 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Oedekoven, Wolf-Dieter, Dipl. Ing. Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106458.3 | 20.08.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | DE19800023270U | 01.09.1980 Original published format: DE 8023270 U | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047876 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/10, B65D1/24 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B65D1/243 (EP);
B65D25/205 (EP);
B65D2501/24019 (EP);
B65D2501/2407 (EP);
B65D2501/24133 (EP);
B65D2501/24152 (EP);
B65D2501/24216 (EP);
B65D2501/2435 (EP);
B65D2501/24808 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Flaschenkasten | [1982/12] | English: | Bottle-box | [1982/12] | French: | Caisse pour bouteilles | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/21] | 28.02.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH537842 [ ]; | AT300645B [ ]; | AT357099B [ ] |