EP0046955 - Device for the dry cross-linking of elastomeric strands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Troester Maschinenfabrik Am Brabrinke 1-4 D-30519 Hannover / DE | [1982/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focht, Harry Dicken Riede 2 D-3005 Hemmingen 2 / DE | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Junius, Walther Wolfstrasse 24 D-30519 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | Junius, Walther, Dr. Wolfstrasse 24 D-30519 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106538.2 | 22.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | DE19803033012 | 02.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3033012 | [1982/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0046955 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046955 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/00, B29C35/00, H05B6/80 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
H01B13/145 (EP,US);
B29C35/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
H01B13/003 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1982/10] | H01B13/00, B29H5/28, H05B6/80 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die trockene Vernetzung von Strängen aus Elastomeren | [1982/10] | English: | Device for the dry cross-linking of elastomeric strands | [1982/10] | French: | Dispositif pour la réticulation à sec de cordons élastomères | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 31.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1915342 [ ] (SOULIER JOEL HENRI AUGUST); | CH523646 [ ] (TROESTER MASCHF PAUL [DE]); | DD97117 [ ]; | DE2154344 [ ] (TROESTER MASCHF PAUL); | DE2846610 [ ] (TROESTER MASCHF PAUL) |