EP0057245 - Cationic triazine dyestuffs, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunde, Klaus, Dr. Uppersberg 45 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1982/32] | Application number, filing date | 81106548.1 | 24.08.1981 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | DE19803048998 | 24.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3048998 | [1982/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057245 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057245 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057245 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09B44/02, D06P1/41, D21H3/80 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
C09B44/02 (EP);
C09B43/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/32] | Title | German: | Kationische Triazinfarbstoffe, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1982/32] | English: | Cationic triazine dyestuffs, their preparation and their use | [1982/32] | French: | Colorants triaziniques cationiques, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1982/32] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/32] | 11.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2424305 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) |