EP0046974 - Process for the production of high-purity metallic iron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solex Research Corporation of Japan 23-9, Maruyama-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states Solex Research Corporation of Japan 23-9, Maruyama-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Morio 8-23-22, Minamitsukakuchi-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Sanji 13-8, Fukakusa Nanmei-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106593.7 | 25.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | JP19800119308 | 29.08.1980 Original published format: JP 11930880 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046974 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046974 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046974 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C21B15/00 | [1982/10] | CPC: |
C21B15/00 (EP,US);
Y10S423/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von sehr reinem metallischen Eisen | [1982/10] | English: | Process for the production of high-purity metallic iron | [1982/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation de fer métallique très pur | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1135699 [ ] (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | GB507277 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | FR2351055 [ ] (FREEPORT MINERALS CO [US]); | US3666446 [ ] (COOK LORNE F, et al); | [P]GB2063229 (UOP INC) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 91, 1979, page 659, Abstract 150380s, Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A.: E.G. IPPOLITOV et al.: "Chemical Properties of Iron Fluoride"; & IZV. AKAD. NAUK GRUZ. SSR. SER. KHIM. 1979, 5(1), Pages 7-12. |