EP0047427 - 1:2-Chromium complex dyestuffs containing sulfonic-acid groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Hans, Dr. Roemerweg 31 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Grychtol, Klaus, Dr. Seebacher Strasse 96A D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | [1982/11] | Application number, filing date | 81106609.1 | 26.08.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | DE19803034002 | 10.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3034002 | [1982/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047427 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047427 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09B55/00, // D06P3/04 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
C09B55/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/11] | Title | German: | Sulfonsäuregruppenhaltige 1:2-Chromkomplexfarbstoffe | [1982/11] | English: | 1:2-Chromium complex dyestuffs containing sulfonic-acid groups | [1982/11] | French: | Colorants 1:2 complexes de chrome contenant des groupes d'acide sulfonique | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/11] | 07.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2123453 [ ]; | DE2501469 [ ] (BASF AG) |