EP0051122 - Air induction structure for an automobile air cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omote, Kazuaki 1-6-308, Nishikaigan 3-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashida, Masayoshi 4-6-810, Onodai 6-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106651.3 | 26.08.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | JP19800155897U | 31.10.1980 Original published format: JP 15589780 U | [1982/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051122 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051122 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051122 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60K13/02, // F02M35/10 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
F02M35/10013 (EP,US);
B60K13/02 (EP,US);
F02M35/10262 (EP,US);
F02M35/161 (EP,US);
F02M35/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/19] | Title | German: | Luftaufnahmeanordnung für einen Kraftfahrzeugluftreiniger | [1982/19] | English: | Air induction structure for an automobile air cleaner | [1982/19] | French: | Structure d'admission d'air pour un épurateur d'air d'automobile | [1982/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 10.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1166356 (INTERNAT HAVESTER COMPANY [US]); | [E]GB2059288 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]GB2011273 (FIAT VEICOLI IND); | [A]GB1017885 (AUSTIN MOTOR CO LTD) |