EP0065595 - Water-soluble triazine compounds, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1987 [1987/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stöhr, Frank-Michael, Dr. Höhenstrasse 130 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 02 /
Nickel, Horst, Dr. Fontanestrasse 23 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1982/48] | Application number, filing date | 81106799.0 | 01.09.1981 | [1982/48] | Priority number, date | DE19813114088 | 08.04.1981 Original published format: DE 3114088 | [1982/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0065595 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0065595 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065595 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/48, C09B62/08, C09B44/02, D06P1/38, D21H3/80 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
C09B62/08 (EP,US);
C07D251/48 (EP,US);
C07D251/54 (EP,US);
D21H21/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/48] | C07D403/04, C09B62/08, C09B44/02, D06P1/38, D21H3/80 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/48] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Triazinverbindungen, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/48] | English: | Water-soluble triazine compounds, their preparation and their use | [1982/48] | French: | Composés triaziniques solubles dans l'eau, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1982/48] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1419859 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR2262512 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) |