EP0047926 - Remote control for disconnecting the drives of ink metering elements in rotary printing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.03.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolza-Schünemann, Claus August Otto-Nagler Strasse17 D-8700 Würzburg / DE | [1982/12] | Application number, filing date | 81106927.7 | 04.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | DE19803034417 | 12.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3034417 | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047926 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047926 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0047926 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/04, B41F33/16 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B41F33/16 (EP,US);
B41F31/045 (EP,US);
Y10S101/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Steuerung zur Abschaltung angetriebener Farbdosierelemente in Rotationsdruckmaschinen | [1982/12] | English: | Remote control for disconnecting the drives of ink metering elements in rotary printing machines | [1982/12] | French: | Commande de la mise hors circuit de l'entraînement des éléments de dosage d'encre dans des machines d'impression rotatives | [1982/12] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/43] | 10.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.1985
19.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE MAN ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung / FTB S Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | 02
31.05.1985
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.1985
19.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE MAN ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung / FTB S Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
31.05.1985
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [1985/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.05.1985
19.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE MAN ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung / FTB S Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | 05.09.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.02.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.12.1989 | Appeal received No. T0018/90 | 17.01.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.06.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2115653 [ ] (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG KOM F POLYGR); | US3792659 [ ] (ALBRECHT H); | FR2427912 [ ] (HARRIS CORP [US]) |