EP0047942 - Agricultural machine, in particular a tractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saemann, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosensteiner Hang 11 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 02 /
Koegler, Hans-Jürger, Ing.grad. Pommernstrasse 88 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Sonns, Eugen Triebstrasse 68 D-6805 Heddesheim / DE | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Schnabel, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Schuster & Partner Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Schnabel, Hartmut, Dr.-Ing., et al Am Feldrain 13 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106982.2 | 05.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | DE19803034689 | 15.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3034689 | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047942 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047942 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/22, B60B35/10 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B60B35/001 (EP);
B60B35/003 (EP);
B60B35/1027 (EP);
B60B35/109 (EP);
B60B35/124 (EP);
B60K17/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Landmaschine, insbesondere Traktor | [1982/12] | English: | Agricultural machine, in particular a tractor | [1982/12] | French: | Machine agricole, notamment tracteur | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1147125 [ ] (SCHLEPPERWERK NORDHAUSEN VEB); | [Y]CH361482 (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE [DE]); | [Y]GB877749 (C C M CIE CONTINENTALE DE MOTO); | [Y]DE1026579 (KURT SCHROETER, et al); | [Y]US2604332 (KENT OWEN C); | [Y]FR933999 |