EP0047529 - Polyoxymethylene molding blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohan, Melvin Ira 1913 Longcome Drive Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107099.4 | 09.09.1981 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | US19800185409 | 09.09.1980 Original published format: US 185409 | US19810261482 | 07.05.1981 Original published format: US 261482 | [1982/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047529 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047529 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047529 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L59/02 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
C08L59/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L59/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L59/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/11] | Title | German: | Formgemische auf der Basis von Polyoxymethylen | [1982/11] | English: | Polyoxymethylene molding blends | [1982/11] | French: | Mélanges à mouler à base de polyoxyméthylène | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/29] | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4098843 (JOHNSON ROBERT WILLIAM) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 6, February 1979, page 6, no. 39363d Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A., M.V. TSEBRENKO et al.: "Effect of the molecular weight of polyethylene glycols on the viscosity of a poly(oxymethylene) melt. & PLAST. MASSY1978, (11), 24-25 |