EP0048860 - Universal digital network for packet-switched information transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gefrörer, Stanislaus, Dipl.-Math. Flurweg 34 D-8028 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
Vollmeyer, Werner, Dr. Wertheimer Strasse 112 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1982/14] | Application number, filing date | 81107149.7 | 10.09.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | DE19803036740 | 29.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3036740 | [1982/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048860 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048860 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L11/00 | [1982/14] | CPC: |
H04L9/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/14] | Title | German: | Universelles Digitalnetz zur paketvermittelten Informationsübertragung | [1982/14] | English: | Universal digital network for packet-switched information transmission | [1982/14] | French: | Réseau numérique universel pour la transmission d'information par paquets commutés | [1982/14] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/14] | 11.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Request for further processing for: | 11.10.1983 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.1983 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1983 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2241573 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | US3749845 [ ] (FRASER A); | DE2441099 [ ] (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | DE2736858 [ ] (POST OFFICE); | FR2362546 [ ] (POST OFFICE [GB]) | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Communications, Part I, Band Com-28, Nr. 9, September 1980, seiten 1655-1662 New York, U.S.A. O.A. MOWAFI et al.: "Integrated Voice-Data Packet Switching Techniques for Future Military Networks" * seite 1665, rechte splate, zeile 5 - seite 1666, linke spalte, zeile 23 * | [ ] - Colloque International de Commutation International Switching Symposium, 7. - 11. Mai 1979, seiten 757-764 Paris, FR. Y. IKEDA et al.: "Systeme de Commutation de Circuits Virtuels: Un Nouveau Concept Pour les Reseaux Numeriques a Service Integres" * seite 759, linke spalte, zeile 8- seite 764, linke spalte, zeile 12; figuren 3, 7, 9, 12 - 15 * | Examination | DE2522759 |