EP0047987 - Cationic electrodeposition lacquer-coated steel material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/12] | Two layer-coated steel materials and process for producing the same | ||
[1993/16] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.03.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hada, Takashi 27, Higashisowa Nawamachi Tokai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kanamaru, Tatsuya 13-1, Kitanoyama Nawamachi Tokai-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Yutaka 1-39-6, Sakushitamachi Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107163.8 | 10.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | JP19800126013 | 12.09.1980 Original published format: JP 12601380 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047987 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047987 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0047987 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C25D5/10, C25D3/56 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
C25D5/10 (EP,US);
C23C28/025 (EP,US);
C25D3/56 (EP,US);
C25D3/565 (EP,US);
Y10S428/926 (EP,US);
Y10S428/935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12799 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1982/12] | C25D5/10, C25D3/56, C23C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/12] | Title | German: | Kationisches elektrotauchlackiertes Stahlmaterial | [1993/16] | English: | Cationic electrodeposition lacquer-coated steel material | [1993/16] | French: | Matériau enacier revêtu par électrodéposition cationique | [1993/16] |
Former [1982/12] | Mit zwei Schichten bekleidete Stahlmaterialien und Verfahren für ihre Herstellung | ||
Former [1982/12] | Two layer-coated steel materials and process for producing the same | ||
Former [1982/12] | Matériaux en acier revêtus de deux couches et procédé pour les produire | Examination procedure | 10.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 26.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 21.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.1986
22.05.1986
ADMISSIBLE Thyssen Stahl AG August-Thyssen-Str.100 D-4100 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.1986
22.05.1986
ADMISSIBLE Thyssen Stahl AG August-Thyssen-Str.100 D-4100 Duisburg / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | 26.06.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.11.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.11.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 14.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.12.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.09.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.01.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.02.1990 | Appeal received No. T0085/90 | 30.03.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.09.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.1992 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP50021940 [ ]; | FR2377460 [ ] (OXY METAL INDUSTRIES CORP [US]); | [X]FR2442282 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]); | GB786418 [ ] (BRITISH IRON STEEL RESEARCH); | US2832729 [ ] (SAFRANEK WILLIAM H) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 84, No. 12, 22nd March 1976, page 246, Abstract 77749t Columbus, Ohio, US & JP-A-50 021 940 (Nippon Steel Corp.) (08-03-1975), & JP50021940 A 00000000 |