EP0047993 - Vibration attenuating foil and method for its production from aqueous polymer dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/12] | Aqueous polymer dispersion, preparation process, use thereof and foil made thereof | ||
[1986/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Küchler, Manfred Bleibiskopfstrasse 5 D-6370 Oberursel/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Duve, Günther, Dr. Spindelstrasse 36 D-6234 Hattersheim am Main / DE | 03 /
Ebigt, Joachim, Dr. Frauenlobstrasse 76a D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 90 / DE | [1982/12] | Application number, filing date | 81107176.0 | 11.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | DE19803034949 | 17.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3034949 | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047993 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047993 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L31/02, C08L31/04, C08L33/08 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
C08L31/02 (EP,US);
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L2201/50 (EP,US);
C08L31/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/02, C08L31/02 (US,EP);
C08K7/02, C08L31/04 (US,EP);
C08K7/02, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L31/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/49] |
Former [1982/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfende Folie und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung aus wässrigen Kunststoffdispersionen | [1986/49] | English: | Vibration attenuating foil and method for its production from aqueous polymer dispersions | [1986/49] | French: | Feuille pour l'amortissement de vibrations et procédé de sa préparation à partir d'une dispersion aqueuse de polymères | [1986/49] |
Former [1982/12] | Wässrige Kunststoffdispersion, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, ihre Anwendung und aus der Kunststoffdispersion hergestellte Folie | ||
Former [1982/12] | Aqueous polymer dispersion, preparation process, use thereof and foil made thereof | ||
Former [1982/12] | Dispersion aqueuse de polymères, son procédé de préparation, son utilisation et feuille fabriquée à partir de cette dispersion | Examination procedure | 05.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 13.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1274569 [ ] (HOECHST AG) |