EP0054622 - A one-way bubble transfer switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keefe, George Edward 25 Covert Montrose New York 10548 / US | 02 /
Sanders, Ian Lewis 1204 Blackberry Terrace Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Lancaster, James Donald IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester, Hants, S021 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Lancaster, James Donald IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester, Hants, S021 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1982/26] | Chaudhry, Mohammad Saeed IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81107290.9 | 16.09.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218989 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 218989 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054622 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/84, G11C19/08 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
G11C19/0883 (EP,US);
H03K17/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/26] | Title | German: | Einweg-Blasen-Übertragungsschalter | [1982/26] | English: | A one-way bubble transfer switch | [1982/26] | French: | Commutateur unidirectionnel de transfert de bulles | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/26] | 10.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/39] | 29.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4142250 [ ] (KEEFE GEORGE E, et al) | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 20, No. 3August 1977 New York (US) T.W. COLLINS: "H-Bar Transfer Switch" page 1197 * figures; page 1197 * |