EP0049390 - Injection mould for the manufacture of moulded bodies from two kinds of plastics material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Rogg Kunststoff-Metallisierung Fuldaerstrasse 11 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1982/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumeister, Ernst Saidelsteig 3 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Böhme, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Kessel, Dipl.-Ing. V. Böhme Karolinenstrasse 27 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | Böhme, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Kessel, Dipl.-Ing. V. Böhme Karolinenstrasse 27 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107304.8 | 16.09.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | DE19803037252 | 02.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3037252 | [1982/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049390 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049390 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B29F1/12 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
B29C45/062 (EP,US);
B29C45/1615 (EP,US);
B29C45/1635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Spritzgussform zur Herstellung von Formkörpern aus zwei Kunststoffarten | [1982/15] | English: | Injection mould for the manufacture of moulded bodies from two kinds of plastics material | [1982/15] | French: | Moule d'injection pour la fabrication de corps moulés de deux sortes de matières plastique | [1982/15] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 27.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/13] | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR998733 ; | [AD]DE885152 (SCHMIDT MAX); | [A]FR1311054 ; | [A]CH536710 (HEHL KARL [DE]); | [A]US3917789 (HEISLER RAYMOND A); | [A]DE2709000 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) |