EP0055327 - Amorphous metal alloys having enhanced AC magnetic properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/27] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freilich, Alfred 139 E. Northfield Road Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | 02 /
DeCristofaro, Nicholas J. 114 Hillside Avenue Chatham New Jersey 07928 / US | 03 /
Davis, Lance Alan 101 Springbrook Road Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | 04 /
Datta, Amitava 127 Park Avenue Madison New Jersey 07940 / US | [1982/27] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1982/27] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber & Seiffert Postfach 61 45 Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 25 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107559.7 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/27] | Priority number, date | US19800220602 | 29.12.1980 Original published format: US 220602 | [1982/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055327 | Date: | 07.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055327 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0055327 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/00, H01F1/14, C22C38/02 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
H01F1/15308 (EP);
C22C38/02 (KR);
C21D6/008 (EP);
C22C45/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/27] | C22C1/00, H01F1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/27] | Title | German: | Amorphe Metallegierungen mit verbesserten magnetischen Wechselfeldeigenschaften | [1982/27] | English: | Amorphous metal alloys having enhanced AC magnetic properties | [1982/27] | French: | Alliage métallique amorphe présentant de meilleures propriétés magnétiques en alternatif | [1982/27] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 29.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1985
12.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH, Hanau -Bereich Verträge und Patente- Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253 D-63412 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1985
12.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH, Hanau -Bereich Verträge und Patente- Grüner Weg 37 Postfach 2253 D-63412 Hanau / DE | 14.06.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.02.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.07.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 26.09.1987 | Appeal received No. T0377/87 | 11.07.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1988/28] | 18.01.1989 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1989/03] | 01.06.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.05.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.05.1987 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1986/51] | DE | 01.06.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2211536 [ ] (ALLIED CHEM [US]); | US3856513 [ ] (CHEN H, et al); | FR2423547 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | FR2423548 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | FR2442894 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |