EP0049788 - Roller-bearing device operating as screw and nut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1985 [1985/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROLLVIS S.A. 8, Chemin du Centurion CH-1227 Carouge Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | For all designated states ROLLVIS S.A. 8, Chemin du Centurion CH-1227 Carouge Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchsluger, Gérard A l'Essert CH-1164 Buchillon Vaud / CH | [1982/16] | Representative(s) | Micheli, Michel Pierre, et al MICHELI & CIE Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | Micheli, Michel-Pierre, et al MICHELI & CIE, Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 81107563.9 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/16] | Priority number, date | CH19800007535 | 09.10.1980 Original published format: CH 753580 | [1982/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049788 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049788 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049788 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/22 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
F16H25/2252 (EP,US);
F16C19/50 (EP,US);
F16C33/306 (EP,US);
F16H25/2006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1982/16] | Title | German: | Wie eine Schraube und Mutter funktionierende Rollenabwälzvorrichtung | [1982/16] | English: | Roller-bearing device operating as screw and nut | [1982/16] | French: | Dispositif de roulement à rouleaux fonctionnant comme vis et écrou | [1982/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/52] | 11.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]CH290685 (STRANDGREN CARL BRUNO [FR]); | [A]US3101623 (HAYES VERNON H); | [X]FR2093070 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB, et al); | [X]FR2179289 (TECH INTEGRALE [FR]); | [A]DE2540348 (NUSSBAUM KG O) |