Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
17.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] |
15.12.1982 | Change - designated states | published on 16.02.1983 [1983/07] |
29.11.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.02.1983 [1983/05] |
01.09.1982 | Change - representative | published on 03.11.1982 [1982/44] |
08.04.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.06.1982 [1982/23] |