EP0053231 - Dishwasher with a control device for monitoring the rotation of the spray arms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZELTRON ISTITUTO ZANUSSI PER L'ELETTRONICA S.P.A. Via Principe di Udine, 66 I-33030 Campoformido Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For all designated states ZELTRON ISTITUTO ZANUSSI PER L'ELETTRONICA S.P.A. Via Principe di Udine, 66 I-33030 Campoformido Udine / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boscolo, Antonio Via Angelo Emo 33/2 I-34144 Trieste / IT | 02 /
Milanese, Nadia Via Feltre, 4 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al C/o Industrie Zanussi S.p.A. Servizio Brevetti e Documentazione Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | Giugni, Valter, et al c/o Industrie Zanussi S.p.A. Servizio Brevetti e Documentazione Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 81107639.7 | 25.09.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | IT19800045742 | 28.11.1980 Original published format: IT 4574280 | [1982/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053231 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/23, G01P3/488 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
A47L15/0049 (EP);
A47L15/23 (EP);
G01P3/481 (EP);
A47L2401/30 (EP);
A47L2501/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/07] |
Former [1982/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Geschirrspüler mit einer Vorrichtung zum Überwachen der Drehung der Sprüharme | [1982/23] | English: | Dishwasher with a control device for monitoring the rotation of the spray arms | [1982/23] | French: | Lave-vaisselle à dispositif de contrôle de la rotation des bras pulvérisateurs | [1982/23] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/05] | 17.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/38] | 06.04.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1235643 [ ] (TELEFUNKEN PATENT); | CH532143 [ ] (ZELLWEGER USTER AG [CH]); | FR2181554 [ ] (CEM COMP ELECTRO MEC [FR]); | FR2209105 [ ] (DJIAN PIERRE [FR]); | DE2831598 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | GB1566396 [ ] (HUGHES MICROELECTRONICS LTD); | FR2442618 [ ] (INDESIT [IT]) |