EP0051160 - Drive mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacklin, Roger Layton 1730 Glenny Ave Waterloo Iowa 50702 / US | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [1982/19] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur. Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108015.9 | 07.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | US19800198076 | 17.10.1980 Original published format: US 198076 | [1982/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051160 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051160 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051160 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/22 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
F16C19/56 (EP,US);
B60K17/22 (EP,US);
F16C25/08 (EP,US);
F16C27/08 (EP,US);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
F16C19/364 (EP);
F16C19/548 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19595 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/19] | Title | German: | Antriebseinrichtung | [1982/19] | English: | Drive mechanism | [1982/19] | French: | Mécanisme de propulsion | [1982/19] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 10.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1987
14.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Carl Hurth Maschinen- und Zahnradfabrik GmbH & Co. Moosacher Strasse 36 D-80809 München / DE | [1987/25] | 16.06.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.02.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.03.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.10.1987 | [1989/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR641100 (FR DES AUTOMOBILES MORRIS LEON); | [A]US3038346 (MACFARLAND WILLARD C); | [A]DE2706066 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]US3785023 (HARBOTTLE W); | [A]US1867081 (KRIDER GEORGE E); | [A]FR2222895 (NADELLA [FR]); | [A]DE2718861 (JASPER JOSEF); | [A]FR2263417 (INDEX WERKE KG HAHN & TESSKY [DE]) |