EP0054642 - Noise clamping circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1988 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davidson, Evan Ezra Mountain Pass Road Hopewell Junction New York 12533 / US | 02 /
Katopis, George Alexander 5-7 Loudon Drive Fishkill New York 12524 / US | 03 /
Rubin, Barry Jay 43-40 Union Street Flushing New York 11355 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Mönig, Anton IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1982/26] | Busch, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108133.0 | 09.10.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218150 | 19.12.1980 Original published format: US 218150 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0054642 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0054642 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054642 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/56 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
G05F1/467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/26] | Title | German: | Rauschklemmschaltung | [1982/26] | English: | Noise clamping circuit | [1982/26] | French: | Circuit de blocage de bruit | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/26] | 02.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0013099 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [AD]US3654530 (LLOYD ROBERT H F); | [AD]US4027177 (DAVIS WILLIAM F); | [A]US4220876 (RAY KENNETH I [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 8, January 1977, pages 3046-3047, New York, US; J. PARISI: "Decoupling capacitor placement" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 2, no. 8A,January 1980, pages 3410-3414, New York, US; C.W. HO et al.: "Multiple LSI silicon chip modules with power buses composed of laminated silicon sheets with metallized upper and lower surfaces" |