Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0049878
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.10.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
09.03.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] |
06.02.1988 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] |
01.10.1986 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.1986 [1986/47] |
10.01.1985 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] |
30.12.1983 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.02.1984 [1984/09] |
11.06.1982 |
Publication of search report |
published on 11.08.1982 [1982/32] |
20.02.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.04.1982 [1982/16] |
20.02.1982 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.04.1982 [1982/16] |