Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE6408T | 15.03.1984 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3038208 | 09.10.1980 | EP81108141 | 09.10.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0049878 | Global Dossier | 29.02.1984 | B1 | EP0049878 | 11.08.1982 | A3 | EP0049878 | 21.04.1982 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3038208 | 09.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3038208 | 29.04.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3038208 | 09.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5789501 | 03.06.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3038208 | 09.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4443020 | 17.04.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3038208 | 09.10.1980 |