EP0051174 - Electrode for a plasma etchings plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/19] | Electrode for a plasma etching plant | ||
[1982/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1983 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brabetz, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Böttcherstrasse 33 D-8000 München 60 / DE | 02 /
Mann, Wolfgang Lindenstrasse 18 D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | 03 /
Steiner, Rainer, Dipl.-Phys Schneemannstrasse 1 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1982/19] | Application number, filing date | 81108291.6 | 13.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | DE19803041551 | 04.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3041551 | [1982/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0051174 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0051174 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H05K3/26, H01L21/263, H05H1/24, C23F1/00, // C23F1/00 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
H05K3/0055 (EP);
H05K2203/095 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/50] | H05K3/00, H05K3/26, H01L21/263, C23F1/00, // C23F1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1982/50] | H05K3/00, H01L21/263, H05H1/24, // C23F1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1982/19] | H05K3/26, H01L21/263, H05H1/24, // C23F1/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/19] | Title | German: | Elektroden für Plasma-Ätzanlage | [1982/19] | English: | Electrode for a plasma etchings plant | [1982/50] | French: | Electrode pour équipement de décapage de plasma | [1982/19] |
Former [1982/19] | Electrode for a plasma etching plant | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 01.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/07] | 12.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2536871 ; | [A]WO8002353 |