EP0052763 - Process for direct-printing with ceramic colouring agents, and printing means therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGROB ANLAGENBAU GMBH Münchener Str. 101 D-8045 Ismaning / DE | [1982/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rumbach, Karl Fr., Dipl.-Ing. Liesingstrasse 6 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108630.5 | 21.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | DE19803043741 | 20.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043741 | [1982/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052763 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052763 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/80, C09D3/81, B41M1/34, B44C1/16, C09D11/10 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M1/34 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D4/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/06, C08F265/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Direktdruck von keramischen Farben sowie Druckmedium hierfür | [1982/22] | English: | Process for direct-printing with ceramic colouring agents, and printing means therefor | [1982/22] | French: | Procédé d'impression directe de colorants céramiques ainsi que des moyens d'impressions pour ceux-ci | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 26.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.1985 | SE | 30.04.1985 | [1988/13] |
Former [1986/28] | NL | 03.04.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2224277 (ALBRECHT J FA, et al) |