Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0064094


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.12.1985 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.02.1986 [1986/06]
01.12.1984 (Expected) grant published on  30.01.1985 [1985/05]
10.09.1982 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.11.1982 [1982/45]
10.09.1982 Request for examination filed published on  10.11.1982 [1982/45]