blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0064094

EP0064094 - Electric commutation device for the representation of a bus-bar system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.1985
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.1986 [1986/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/45]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gmeinder, Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimlerstrasse 38
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
02 / Segschneider, Josef
Lederhosenstrasse 27
D-8551 Röttenbach / DE
[1982/45]
Application number, filing date81108645.321.10.1981
[1982/45]
Priority number, dateDE1981311639224.04.1981         Original published format: DE 3116392
[1982/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0064094
Date:10.11.1982
Language:DE
[1982/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0064094
Date:30.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1982
ClassificationIPC:H02J13/00, H02B1/24, H02H7/22
[1982/45]
CPC:
H02B1/24 (EP); H02J13/00016 (EP); H02J13/00034 (EP);
H02J13/00036 (EP); Y02B90/20 (EP); Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S40/124 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/45]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Schaltungsanordnung zur Nachbildung einer Sammelschienenanlage[1982/45]
English:Electric commutation device for the representation of a bus-bar system[1982/45]
French:Dispositif de commutation électrique pour la représentation d'une installation de barres omnibus[1982/45]
Examination procedure21.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/45]
28.02.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.05.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.1984Fee for grant paid
24.05.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.10.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1264580  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]DE2753659  (RUHRTAL GMBH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.